Dundee City Council - 15/04/2002
At a MEETING of DUNDEE CITY COUNCIL held at Dundee on 15th April, 2002.
Present:-
COUNCILLORS
Lord Provost John R LETFORD |
Andrew DAWSON |
Dave BEATTIE |
George de GERNIER |
Willie W SAWERS |
C D P FARQUHAR |
Helen WRIGHT |
Joe FITZPATRICK |
Fraser MACPHERSON |
Betty WARD |
Allan PETRIE |
Julia M STURROCK |
Jill SHIMI |
George REGAN |
Neil GLEN |
Neil I C POWRIE |
Bruce D MACKIE |
Elizabeth F FORDYCE |
Ian BORTHWICK |
Roderick A J WALLACE |
Fiona M GRANT |
Robin PRESSWOOD |
Kenneth J N GUILD |
David BOWES |
Richard BEATTIE |
Derek J SCOTT |
Mervyn J ROLFE |
|
John CORRIGAN |
|
Lord Provost, John R Letford, Convener, in the Chair.
Prior to the commencement of business a minute's silence was held in respect of Her Majesty the Queen Mother, who died on 30th March, 2002.
I MINUTES
The undernoted minutes were submitted and noted.
1.Minute of City Council dated 4th March, 2002
2.Minute of Licensing Committee dated 7th March, 2002
3.Minute of City Council dated 11th March, 2002
4.Minute of Neighbourhood Resources and Development Committee dated 11th March, 2002
5.Minute of Economic Development Committee dated 11th March, 2002
6.Minute of DSO Committee dated 11th March, 2002
7.Minute of Finance Committee dated 11th March, 2002
8.Minute of Policy and Resources Committee dated 11th March, 2002
9.Minute of Personnel and Management Services Committee dated 11th March, 2002
10.Minute of Education Committee dated 18th March, 2002
11.Minute of Leisure Services Committee dated 18th March, 2002
12.Minute of Arts and Heritage Committee dated 18th March, 2002
13.Minute of Housing Committee dated 18th March, 2002
14.Minute of Environmental and Consumer Protection Committee dated 18th March, 2002
15.Minute of Social Work Committee dated 18th March, 2002
16.Minute of Policy and Resources Committee dated 18th March, 2002
17.Minute of Personnel and Management Services Committee dated 18th March, 2002
18.Minute of Development Quality Committee dated 25th March, 2002
19.Minute of Planning and Transportation Committee dated 25th March, 2002
II APPOINTMENT - DEPUTE CONVENER OF LICENSING COMMITTEE
Following the resignation of Councillor Rolfe from the Licensing Committee, the Council agreed that Councillor Grant be appointed Depute Convener.
LORD PROVOST JOHN R LETFORD, Convener.