Dundee City Council - 27/10/2008
At a MEETING of the DUNDEE CITY COUNCIL held at Dundee on 27th October, 2008.
Present:-
Lord Provost John R LETFORD |
|
|
BAILIES
George REGAN |
Willie SAWERS |
Derek J SCOTT |
Helen WRIGHT |
Roderick A J WALLACE |
Ian BORTHWICK |
COUNCILLORS
Kevin KEENAN |
Fraser MACPHERSON |
Will DAWSON |
Mohammed ASIF |
Helen DICK |
Bob DUNCAN |
Laurie BIDWELL |
Ken GUILD |
Stewart HUNTER |
Tom FERGUSON |
Jim BARRIE |
Ken LYNN |
Brian GORDON |
Jimmy BLACK |
Christina ROBERTS |
Richard McCREADY |
David BOWES |
Alan G ROSS |
Joe MORROW |
Andrew DAWSON |
Donald HAY |
Lord Provost John R LETFORD, Convener, in the Chair.
I MINUTES
The undernoted minutes were submitted and noted.
Minute of Licensing Committee dated 4th September, 2008
Minute of City Council dated 8th September, 2008
Minute of Planning and Transport Committee dated 8th September, 2008
Minute of Leisure, Arts and Communities Committee dated 8th September, 2008
Minute of Policy and Resources dated 8th September, 2008
Minute of Development Quality Committee dated 8th September, 2008
Minute of Licensing Board dated 18th September, 2008
Minute of City Council dated 22nd September, 2008
Minute of Education Committee dated 22nd September, 2008
Minute of Economic Development Committee dated 22nd September, 2008
Minute of Leisure, Arts and Communities Committee dated 22nd September, 2008
Minute of Housing, Dundee Contract Services and Environment Services Committee dated 22nd September, 2008
Minute of Social Work and Health Committee dated 22nd September, 2008
Minute of Policy and Resources Committee dated 22nd September, 2008
Minute of Licensing Committee dated 25th September, 2008
Minute of Licensing Committee dated 2nd October, 2008
II DEPUTE LORD PROVOST
It was reported that Councillor Morrow had intimated his resignation from the above position with effect from 27th October, 2008.
The Council agreed that the vacancy be filled by Bailie Borthwick.
III CONVENER OF ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT
It was reported that Councillor Morrow had intimated his resignation from the above position with effect from 27th October, 2008.
The Council agreed that the vacancy be filled by Lord Provost Letford.
IV DEPUTE CONVENER OF POLICY AND RESOURCES
It was reported that Councillor Morrow had intimated his resignation from the above position with effect from 27th October, 2008.
The Council agreed that the vacancy be filled by Bailie Regan.
V DEPUTE CONVENER OF PLANNING AND TRANSPORT
It was reported that Councillor Morrow had intimated his resignation from the above position with effect from 27th October, 2008.
The Council agreed that the vacancy be filled by Councillor Ferguson.
VI DEPUTE CONVENER OF BEST VALUE PERFORMANCE AND EFFICIENCY SUB-COMMITTEE
It was reported that Councillor Morrow had intimated his resignation from the above position with effect from 27th October, 2008.
The Committee agreed that the vacancy be filled by Bailie Regan.
VII COSLA EXECUTIVE GROUPS
(i) RESOURCES AND CAPACITY MANAGEMENT GROUP
(ii) STRATEGIC HUMAN RESOURCE MANAGEMENT GROUP
It was reported that Councillor Morrow had intimated his resignations from the above with effect from 27th October, 2008.
The Council agreed that the vacancies be filled by Bailie Regan.
Lord Provost John R LETFORD, Convener.